CA AB1837 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 642, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 642, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2924f, 2924g, 2924h, and 2924m of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 2924d of, and to add and repeal Section 2924o of, the Civil Code, relating to real property.
Title
Residential real property: foreclosure.
Sponsors
Asm. Mia Bonta [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1837 Mia Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1837 Mia Bonta et al. By Skinner (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1837 Mia Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1837 Mia Bonta et al. By Skinner (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1837 Mia Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 642, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 18.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5231.). |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 21). |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 18.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (March 15). |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 2924 | Amended Code | Citation Text |