CA AB1837 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6902.5 of, and to add Sections 17053.98 and 23698 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income taxes: credits: motion pictures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1837 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
2018-06-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2018-06-13SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-06-11SenateJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4554.)
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-05-10SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5112.)
2018-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-05-07AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.)
2018-01-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-01-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
2018-01-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17053.98New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code23698New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code6902.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback