CA AB1837 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 2.6 (commencing with Section 66010.96) of Chapter 2 of Part 40 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: Office of Higher Education
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1837 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1837 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and G.O. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 6. Page 5024.) |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66010.96 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |