CA AB1836 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 819, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 819, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5350.5 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to conservatorships.
Title
Mental health: referral of conservatees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1836 MAIENSCHEIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1836 Maienschein By Hertzberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1836 MAIENSCHEIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1836 Maienschein By Hertzberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1836 MAIENSCHEIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 819, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6474.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6483.). |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5484.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5081.) |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2016-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5350.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5350.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5352 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5354 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5360 | Amended Code | Citation Text |