CA AB1834 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 44, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 44, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 15819.403 of the Government Code, relating to corrections, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Corrections: omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - AB 1834 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 56 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1834 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1834 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1834 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1834 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 44, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:45 p.m. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 24. Page 5819.). |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 25. Page 5812.) |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4680.). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4554.) |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5111.) |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.) |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15819.403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |