CA AB1831 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 638, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 638, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to state claims, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1831 Gonzalez By Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1831 Gonzalez Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1831 Gonzalez Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 638, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2680.). |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2909.). |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee May 31. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Introduced pursuant to Joint Rule 54. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |