CA AB1831 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 43, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 43, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69511 of the Education Code, to amend Section 3312 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to add Article 2.1 (commencing with Section 13105) to Chapter 2 of Part 3 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, to amend Section 50661 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 185020 of the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Section 10202.5 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State government: appointments: infrastructure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Senate - (Y: 9 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - AB 1831 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 55 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1831 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1831 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - AB 1831 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 55 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1831 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1831 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 43, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:45 p.m. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 25. Page 5817.). |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 25. Page 5812.) |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 25. Page 5812.) |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 4678.). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 6.) (June 13). |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4554.) |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5109.) |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.) |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69511 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 3312 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50661 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 10202.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 185020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |