CA AB1831 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.249 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.209 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: prescription drugs: refills.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-23 - Assembly - AB 1831 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1831 Low By Hernandez (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1831 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1831 Low By Hernandez (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1831 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6126.). |
2016-08-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5044.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 8. Page 5132.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (May 27). |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.249 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.209 | New Code | See Bill Text |