CA AB1830 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to state claims, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State claims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1830 Gonzalez By Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1830 Gonzalez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-07-08AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-07-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-07-01SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1874.).
2019-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1830.).
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15).
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-05-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee May 9.
2019-04-08AssemblyIntroduced pursuant to Joint Rule 54.
2019-04-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback