CA AB1827 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1203.2, 3000.08, and 3004 of, and to add Section 3000.085 to, the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: high-risk parolees.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3000.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3000.085 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 3004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |