CA AB1826 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 727, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 12.9 (commencing with Section 42649.8) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid waste: organic waste.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-14 - Assembly - AB 1826 CHESBRO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1826 Chesbro By Hill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1826 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 727, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2014-08-21AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2014-08-14AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 6045.).
2014-08-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2014-08-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4406.).
2014-08-06SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-05SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
2014-07-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25).
2014-06-16SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2014-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on E.Q.
2014-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 4955.)
2014-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 7).
2014-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2014-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2014-04-07AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2014-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2014-03-24AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2014-03-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2014-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2014-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code40003Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code42649.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1826&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1826_bill_20140218_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1826_bill_20140324_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1826_bill_20140422_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1826_bill_20140616_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1826_bill_20140701_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1826_bill_20140806_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1826_bill_20140818_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1826_bill_20140928_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1826_vote_20140428_000004_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1826_vote_20140507_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1826_vote_20140515_1114AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1826_vote_20140625_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1826_vote_20140811_0236PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1826_vote_20140814_1148AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback