CA AB1824 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 466, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 11011 and 65589.4 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 21080.21, 21099, 21108, 21152, 21152.1, 21161, and 21177 of, and to add and repeal Section 21080.14 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Environmental Quality Act: exemption for closure of railroad grade crossing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1824 NAT. RES. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By FRIEDMAN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1824 NAT. RES. (Friedman) By Allen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1824 NAT. RES. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-02 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 466, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-02 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-23AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3280.).
2019-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
2019-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2702.).
2019-09-04SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom inactive file.
2019-06-27SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen.
2019-06-27SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2019-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-24SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1830.)
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15).
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2019-04-11Assembly(pending re-referral to Com. on A. & A.R.)
2019-04-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1150.)
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and A. & A.R.
2019-03-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 12.
2019-03-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback