CA AB1823 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 399, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 399, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4290.1, 4630.1, and 4630.2 of, to add Section 4005 to, and to repeal Section 4124.7 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to fire protection.
Title
Fire protection: local fire planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1823 NAT. RES. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By FRIEDMAN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1823 NAT. RES. (Friedman) By Stern (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1823 NAT. RES. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1823 NAT. RES. (Friedman) By Stern (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1823 NAT. RES. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 399, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3428.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2762.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Stern. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1830.) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 12. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 4005 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 4124.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4290.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4630.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4630.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |