CA AB1823 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 12301.24 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
In-home supportive services: provider orientation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1823 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1823 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 5262.) |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (June 26). |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4881.) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5105.) |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.) |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12301.24 | New Code | See Bill Text |