CA AB1822 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 20, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 20, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 56074, 56133, 56663, 57077, and 57103 of, and to add Section 56074.5 to, the Government Code, and to repeal Sections 1 and 2 of Chapter 805 of the Statutes of 2004, relating to local government.
Title
Local Government: omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1822 L. GOV (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1822 L. GOV. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1822 L. GOV. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 20, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-06-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1606.). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1592.) |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 11. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 56074 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 56074.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 56133 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 56663 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 57077 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 57103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |