CA AB1820 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 834, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12930 of the Government Code, relating to personal rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal rights: civil liability and enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1820 JUD. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By STONE (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1820 JUD. (Stone) By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1820 JUD (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1820 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 834, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3471.).
2019-09-11AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 11).
2019-09-10AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3303.)
2019-08-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2019-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-08-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2269.).
2019-08-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-15SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-15SenateOrdered to third reading.
2019-08-15SenateAction rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
2019-07-08SenateIn Senate. Held at Desk.
2019-07-08AssemblyOrdered to the Senate.
2019-07-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-07-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1880.).
2019-06-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-06-24SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-24SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-17SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-06SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1523.)
2019-05-01AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 30).
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-03-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 6.
2019-03-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12930Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback