CA AB182 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 14025) and the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 14027) to, and to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 14040) to, Chapter 1.5 of Division 14 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
California Voting Rights Act of 2001.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Roger Hernandez [D] | Asm. Ian Calderon [D] |
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-08 - Assembly - AB 182 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB182 Alejo By Hueso (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - AB 182 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB182 Alejo By Hueso (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - AB 182 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-15 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2015-10-10 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2015-09-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2941.). |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2483.). |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hueso. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 16). |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 1378.) |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 5). |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD. |
2015-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2015-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 14025 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 14027 | New Code | See Bill Text |