CA AB1818 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 637, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 637, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 50474.21, 50474.22, 50474.3, and 68514 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 104113 and 115800 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 1463.010 of the Penal Code, relating to state government.
Title
State government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1818 JUD. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By STONE (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1818 JUD. (Stone) By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1818 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1818 JUD. (Stone) By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1818 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 637, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2902.). |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2269.). |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1261.) |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 6. |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 50474.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 50474.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 50474.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68514 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 104113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 115800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1463.010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |