CA AB1816 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 833, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 678, 1063.1 and 10094.2 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1816 Daly Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1816 Daly et al. By Rubio Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1816 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 833, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-12AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3477.).
2019-09-11AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 11).
2019-09-10AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3303.)
2019-09-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2019-09-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
2019-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-09SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2693.).
2019-08-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-27SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-21SenateFrom committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 21)
2019-08-13SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-07-11SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2019-07-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
2019-07-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-09SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-06-27SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on INS.
2019-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1588.)
2019-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2019-03-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 5.
2019-03-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code10094.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1063.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code678New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback