CA AB1814 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-14 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Bradford.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-14 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Bradford.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10232.2 of the Insurance Code, relating to long-term care insurance.
Title
Long-term care insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1814 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1814 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-14 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Bradford. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1473.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 5. |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10232.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |