CA AB1814 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-05 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-05 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14669.18 to the Government Code, to amend Section 6971 of the Public Contract Code, to add Section 99232.7 to the Public Utilities Code, to amend Section 2034 of, and to add and repeal Section 114.5 of, the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Sections 1685 and 5205.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1814 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1814 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 13). |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5101.) |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.) |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14669.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 6971 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99232.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 114.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2034 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 1685 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 5205.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |