CA AB1812 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 36, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 4021.5, 4052.2, 4057, 4081, and 4400 of, to add Section 4203.6 to, and to add Article 13.5 (commencing with Section 4187) to Chapter 9 of Division 2 of, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 12838.1, 13332.09, 14670, and 15820.913 of the Government Code, to amend Section 103680 of, and to add Section 1797.165 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 680.3, 832.6, 1170, 4115.5, 6031.4, 6040, and 13603 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 13523 of, to add Sections 2067 and 3007.08 to, and to add and repeal Sections 6402.5 and 13509 of, the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 607, 912, 1178, 1731.5, 1769, and 1771 of, to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 1450) to Part 1 of Division 2 of, and to add and repeal Section 1731.7 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public safety, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public safety omnibus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Assembly - AB 1812 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1812 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1812 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 36, Statutes of 2018.
2018-06-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-06-19AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
2018-06-18AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 5858.).
2018-06-18AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 5854.)
2018-06-18AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 5854.)
2018-06-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-06-18SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 4728.).
2018-06-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 18).
2018-06-13SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-05-10SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5100.)
2018-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-05-07AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.)
2018-01-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-01-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
2018-01-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code4021.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4052.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4057Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4081Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4203.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4400Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12838.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code13332.09Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14670Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code15820.913Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code103680Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1797.165New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1170Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13523New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code13603Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code4115.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code6031.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code6040Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code680.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code832.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1178Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1450New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1731.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1731.7Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1769Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1771Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code607Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code912Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback