CA AB1811 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 35, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 69519 of the Education Code, to add Section 17566 to, and to add and repeal Section 17705 of, the Family Code, to amend Section 6253.2 of the Government Code, to add and repeal Sections 1531.6 and 1538.75 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 246 of the Labor Code, and to amend Sections 9719.5, 10553.1, 11325.23, 11364, 11387, 11405, 11450, 11462.04, 12301.6, 14132.97, 16121, and 18941 of, to add Sections 10823.1, 10823.2, 11450.021, 11450.022, 11450.026, 11453.01, 11461.36, 12201.01, 14132.971, 16521.7, 18900.5, 18900.6, and 18900.7 to, to add Article 3.4 (commencing with Section 11330.6) to Chapter 2 of Part 3 of Division 9 of, to add Chapter 14 (commencing with Section 15770) to Part 3 of Division 9 of, to add and repeal Section 10072.3 of, to repeal Section 12200.5 of, and to repeal and add Section 10626 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to human services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human services omnibus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Assembly - AB 1811 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1811 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1811 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 35, Statutes of 2018.
2018-06-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-06-19AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
2018-06-18AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 5857.).
2018-06-18AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 5852.)
2018-06-18AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 5852.)
2018-06-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-06-18SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 4726.).
2018-06-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 18).
2018-06-13SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-05-10SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5099.)
2018-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-05-07AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.)
2018-01-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-01-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
2018-01-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code69519Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code17566New CodeSee Bill Text
Family Code17705Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code6253.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1531.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1538.75Repealed CodeCitation Text
Labor Code246Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10072.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10553.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10823.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10823.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11325.23Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11364Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11387Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11405Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11450Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11450.021New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11450.022New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11450.026New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11453.01New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11461.36New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11462.04Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code12201.01New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code12301.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14132.97Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14132.971New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16121Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16521.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18900.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18900.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18900.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18941Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code9719.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback