CA AB1811 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 94, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 94, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 149.5 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
High-occupancy vehicle lanes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1811 Buchanan By Corbett (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Assembly - AB 1811 BUCHANAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Assembly - AB 1811 BUCHANAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 94, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 4140.). |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 4707.) |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 21). |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 149.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |