CA AB1806 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12096.3 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 12097.1 of, to add Section 12096.3.1 to, and to add Article 4.3 (commencing with Section 12096.7) to Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, and to repeal Sections 71040 and 71041 of the Public Resources Code, relating to economic development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GO-Biz Information Technology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2019-03-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
2019-02-28AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12096.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12097.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code71040Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code71041Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback