CA AB1805 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 6302 and 6309 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational safety and health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1805 L. & E. Assembly Third Reading By KALRA (Y: 62 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-08-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-08-12SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2138.).
2019-07-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-01SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-05-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 11. Page 1767.)
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (May 8).
2019-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-03-28AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2019-03-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
2019-02-28AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code6302Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code6309Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback