CA AB1804 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6409.1 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational injuries and illnesses: reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1804 L. & E. (Kalra) By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1804 L. & E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-08-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
2019-07-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-07-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1872.).
2019-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-24SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-06-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-05-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1480.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2019-03-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
2019-02-28AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code6409.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback