CA AB1802 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Hearing: Jun 25 @ 12:00 pm in Room 3191
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 655 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Optometry: optometrists: dispensing opticians.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 1802 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-05-17SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-05-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4999.)
2018-04-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-26AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2018-04-26AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-26AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-01-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2018-01-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code3041Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code655Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback