CA AB1801 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 761, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 761, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 135 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 37220.7, 45203, 79020, and 88203 of the Education Code, and to amend Sections 6700, 19853, and 19853.1 of the Government Code, relating to Genocide Remembrance Day.
Title
State holidays: Genocide Remembrance Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Assembly - AB 1801 Nazarian Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB1801 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1801 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB1801 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1801 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 761, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4984.). |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and ED. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HIGHER ED. |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 37220.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 45203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 79020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19853 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19853.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |