CA AB1801 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19020, 21283, 21283.5, 21285, 21288, 21288.5, 21563, 21563.5, and 65071 of, and to repeal Article 9 (commencing with Section 10511) of Chapter 3 of Part 2 of Division 5 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to cattle, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Cattle: inspections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-05 - Assembly - AB 1801 AGRI. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By EGGMAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1801 AGRI. (Eggman) By Dahle (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1801 AGRI. Assembly Third Reading By EGGMAN (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1801 AGRI. (Eggman) By Dahle (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1801 AGRI. Assembly Third Reading By EGGMAN (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3030.). |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2459.). |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 12). |
2019-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 1912.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 16). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 10511 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 19020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 21283 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 21283.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 21285 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 21288 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 21288.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 21563 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 21563.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 65071 | Amended Code | Citation Text |