CA AB1800 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 628, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2051.5 of the Insurance Code, relating to fire insurance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire insurance: indemnity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1800 Levine Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1800 Levine et al. By Glazer Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 1800 LEVINE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 628, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-21 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-31AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-31SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 6081.).
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-22SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-08-22SenateFrom inactive file.
2018-07-02SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Glazer.
2018-06-19SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on INS.
2018-04-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4898.)
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2018-04-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2018-01-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2018-01-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code2051.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback