CA AB18 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 680 of the Penal Code, relating to evidence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual assault forensic evidence: testing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2022-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2021-05-20AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2021-04-14AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-03-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-24AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code680Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback