CA AB18 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 853 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healing arts: Licensed Physicians and Dentists from Mexico Pilot Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - AB 18 GARCIA, E. Third Reading Urgency (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-08-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-08-08SenateRe-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-07-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-07-03SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-08-31SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 31). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-08-31Senate(Coms. on N.R.&W. and GOV. & F.)
2017-08-31SenateJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2290.)
2017-08-30SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2017-06-28SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F.
2017-03-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-03-20AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 645.).
2017-03-08AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-02-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-02-23AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-02-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (February 22).
2017-02-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (February 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-01-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2016-12-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
2016-12-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code853Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5880New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback