CA AB1798 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 206, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 27316 of the Vehicle Code, relating to schoolbuses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schoolbuses: passenger restraint systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1798 Chu By Cannella (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1798 CHU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 206, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5235.).
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5388.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-03-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-03-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and ED.
2018-01-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2018-01-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code27316Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code27316.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback