CA AB1797 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 205, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 10103.4 to the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential property insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-09 - Assembly - AB 1797 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1797 Levine et al. By Gaines (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1797 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 205, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6202.).
2018-07-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-07-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5103.).
2018-06-19SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on INS.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5160.)
2018-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 2).
2018-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2018-01-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2018-01-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code10103.4New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback