CA AB1797 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 402, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 12301.16 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to in-home supportive services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In-home supportive services: application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-22 - Assembly - AB 1797 LACKEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1797 Lackey By Mitchell (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - AB 1797 LACKEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 402, Statutes of 2016.
2016-09-21 Approved by the Governor.
2016-08-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2016-08-22AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6029.).
2016-08-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2016-08-15SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4961.).
2016-08-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2016-06-16SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 14).
2016-05-19SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2016-04-21SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-04-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4462.)
2016-04-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2016-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 13).
2016-03-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-02-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2016-02-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2016-02-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2016-02-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
2016-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code12301.16New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1797&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_bill_20160204_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_bill_20160225_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_bill_20160616_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_bill_20160801_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_bill_20160823_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_bill_20160921_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_vote_20160329_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_vote_20160413_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_vote_20160421_1006AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_vote_20160614_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_vote_20160815_0319PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_vote_20160822_0254PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback