CA AB1796 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 163, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1947.6 of the Civil Code, relating to tenancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rental property: electric vehicle charging stations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Assembly - AB 1796 MURATSUCHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1796 Muratsuchi By Allen (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1796 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 163, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2018-08-06AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 6135.).
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5044.).
2018-06-14SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 12).
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 18. Page 5166.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-01-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2018-01-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1947.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback