CA AB1795 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1797.52 and 1797.218 of, and to add Sections 1797.98, 1797.119, 1797.205, and 1797.260 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency medical services: behavioral health facilities and sobering centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 17).
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-01-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2018-01-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1797.119New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1797.172Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1797.205New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1797.218Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1797.260New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1797.52Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1797.98New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback