CA AB1794 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 68, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 401, 403, and 901 of, and to add Section 401.5 to, the Ojai Basin Groundwater Management Agency Act, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ojai Basin Groundwater Management Agency: Southern California Water Company.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1794 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1794 LIMÓN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 68, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-09 Approved by the Governor.
2018-06-29AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4879.).
2018-06-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5219.)
2018-05-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-01-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2018-01-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback