CA AB1792 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 889, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 889, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 13084 to the Government Code, to amend Section 1095 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, and to add and repeal Section 11026.5 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public benefits.
Title
Public benefits: reports on employers.
Sponsors
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1792 Gomez By Hernandez (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1792 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1792 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1792 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1792 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Labor and Employment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 889, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6725.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6725.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 6729.). |
2014-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 4966.). |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4905.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 25). |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5251.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & E. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13084 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1088.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1095 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 2110.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11026.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |