CA AB1791 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1954.51 and 1954.52 of the Civil Code, relating to residential rental housing.
Title
Rent control: local ordinances: residential units.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and H. & C.D. |
2022-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1954.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1954.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |