CA AB1790 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 338, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 7.7 (commencing with Section 122475) to Division 105 of, and to repeal Section 122477 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to valley fever.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Valley Fever Education, Early Diagnosis, and Treatment Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1790 SALAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1790 Salas et al. By Galgiani (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1790 Salas et al. By Galgiani (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1790 SALAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 338, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-11 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0.).
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5826.).
2018-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-23SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-22SenateFrom committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 22)
2018-08-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
2018-08-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-16SenateAction rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
2018-08-13SenateIn Senate. Held at Desk.
2018-08-13AssemblyOrdered to the Senate.
2018-07-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-07-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5110.).
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5213.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-01-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 8.
2018-01-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code2190.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code122475New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code122477Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1233.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1257.4New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback