CA AB1788 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 120144 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health: Valley Fever.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1788 Salas et al. By Galgiani (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 1788 SALAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-07-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5110.).
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-18SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2018-05-29SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-19SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-19AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4789.)
2018-04-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 11).
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 20).
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-01-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 8.
2018-01-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code120144New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback