CA AB1783 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-19 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 26 @ 10:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 12745, 12760, 12767, 12787, and 65582.1 of, and to add Section 12788 to, the Government Code, and to amend Sections 17008, 17021, 17021.6, 17035, 17037, 17037.5, 50470, 50517.10, and 50715 of, and to add Sections 17021.8, 17030.10, and 50205 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to agricultural employee housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

H-2A worker housing: state funding: streamlined approval process for agricultural employee housing development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1783 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-19SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-08-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 10).
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 11. Page 1971.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 16).
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 24).
2019-04-22AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-04-04AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3).
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-26AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12745Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12760Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12767Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12787Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12788New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65582.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code17008Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code17021Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code17021.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code17021.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code17030Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code17030.10New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code17035Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code17037Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code17037.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50205New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code50470Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50517.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50715Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code12206Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17058Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code23610.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback