CA AB1783 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 17660) to Part 10.5 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to school facilities.
Title
School facilities: nonstructural earthquake hazards: inspection.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Assembly - AB 1783 DODD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1783 Dodd By Wolk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1783 DODD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1783 Dodd By Wolk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1783 DODD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6187.). |
2016-08-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5049.). |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5178.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 17660 | New Code | See Bill Text |