CA AB1780 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Hearing: Jun 26 @ 1:30 pm in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1250.8 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General acute care hospitals: consolidated licensing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1780 Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25SenateIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-11SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-04-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1362.)
2019-04-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1250.8Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback