CA AB1780 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 17053.18 and 23618 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credit: motion pictures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | Assembly | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23618 | New Code | See Bill Text |