CA AB1779 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 865.3 and 865.4 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to sexual orientation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual orientation: change efforts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-01-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
2018-01-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code865.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code865.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code865.4New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback