CA AB1776 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 1797.10 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency medical transport of police dogs: pilot project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1776 Steinorth et al. By Glazer (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 1776 STEINORTH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-08-06SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-06-28SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2018-06-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR.
2018-04-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4893.)
2018-04-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-19AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2018-04-19AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-19AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 4773.)
2018-04-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-12AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2018-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-05AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
2018-01-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
2018-01-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1797.10New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback