CA AB1775 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 327, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 327, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 47 and 51.7 of the Civil Code, and to amend Section 653y of the Penal Code, relating to harassment.
Title
False reports and harassment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1775 JONES-SAWYER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1775 Jones-Sawyer et al. By Skinner (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1775 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1775 Jones-Sawyer et al. By Skinner (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1775 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 327, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5489.). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to the unfinished business file. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4356.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-31 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 3910.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (January 23). |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 51.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 653 | Amended Code | Citation Text |